+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kremer
On May 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
- Fiscal estimate received
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced by Representatives Kremer, Horlacher, Brandtjen, R. Brooks, Jarchow and Knodl; cosponsored by Senators LeMahieu and Nass
+ − Amendment
2015 ASA1-AB226
- Relating to: interest rates on past due amounts.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor