+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Representative Shankland added as a coauthor
On December 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
- Representative Zamarripa added as a coauthor
On December 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Representative Genrich added as a coauthor
On December 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor
On October 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Mursau
On May 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Representative Thiesfeldt added as a coauthor
On April 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs
- Introduced by Representatives Mursau, Ballweg, Berceau, Billings, Born, Bowen, E. Brooks, Considine, Crowley, Doyle, Felzkowski, Goyke, Hesselbein, Hintz, Jacque, Kolste, Kulp, Loudenbeck, Macco, Mason, Meyers, Rohrkaste, Spiros, Spreitzer, Steffen, Stuck, Subeck, C. Taylor, Tusler, VanderMeer and Anderson; cosponsored by Senators Harsdorf, Bewley, Carpenter, Hansen, Johnson, Miller, Olsen, Petrowski, L. Taylor and Wanggaard
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor