+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
- Introduced by Representatives Sargent, Ohnstad, Pope, Johnson, Brostoff, Zepnick, Bowen, Berceau, Kessler, Barnes, Subeck and Hesselbein; cosponsored by Senators Harris Dodd, L. Taylor and C. Larson
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor