+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Published 11-12-2015
- Report approved by the Governor on 11-11-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 77
On November 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 11-10-2015
- Report correctly enrolled on 11-10-2015
On November 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On November 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On November 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 11-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
On June 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 by Committee on Rules
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 0
On May 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On May 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On May 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced by Representatives Kitchens, Ripp, Ballweg, Bernier, E. Brooks, Horlacher, Mursau, A. Ott, Quinn, Spiros, Steffen, Vorpagel and Weatherston; cosponsored by Senators Petrowski, Lassa, Marklein and Olsen
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor