+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 1:02 PM on 6-21-2017 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 11
On June 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 10, Noes 4
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Representative Weatherston added as a coauthor
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities
- Introduced by Representatives R. Brooks, Kuglitsch, Krug, Mursau, Skowronski, Horlacher, Petersen, Jacque, Gannon, Kremer, Murphy, Quinn, Knodl, VanderMeer, Katsma, E. Brooks and Stuck; cosponsored by Senators Roth, LeMahieu, Feyen, Stroebel, Marklein, Petrowski, Darling and Cowles
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor