+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Published 4-9-2015
- Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 11
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2015
On March 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 3-24-2015
On March 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-17-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
- Executive action taken
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On January 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On January 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 1-22-2015 by committee on Rules
On January 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 8, Noes 0
On January 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On January 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On January 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced by Representative J. Ott
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor