+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On June 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Laid on the table
On June 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 6-22-2021 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 5, Noes 3
- Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 5, Noes 3
On June 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Sanfelippo
On April 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On April 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sanfelippo
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections
- Introduced by Representatives Sanfelippo, Edming, Gundrum, Knodl, Krug, Murphy, Neylon, Skowronski, Steffen, VanderMeer and Wichgers; cosponsored by Senators Darling, Stroebel, Wimberger, Ballweg, Bradley, Felzkowski, Feyen, Jacque, Marklein, Nass and Wanggaard
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor