+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senator Olsen added as a cosponsor
- Representatives Duchow, Bowen and Loudenbeck added as coauthors
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
- Representative Petryk added as a coauthor
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor
On April 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development
- Introduced by Representatives Ballweg, Mursau, Skowronski, Novak, Tusler and Billings; cosponsored by Senators Feyen, Lasee, L. Taylor and Cowles
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor