+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (58)
On March 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Published 3-28-2014
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-27-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 154
On March 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2014
- Report correctly enrolled on 3-26-2014
On March 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Action ordered immediately messaged
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 concurred in, Ayes 55, Noes 38, Paired 2
- Assembly Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 55, Noes 38
- Assembly Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Hebl, Goyke, Wachs and Hulsey
On March 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 10:01 AM on 3-20-2014 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
- Referred to committee on Rules
On March 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted)
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 17, Noes 16
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Carpenter, Hansen, L. Taylor, Vinehout, Shilling, Miller, T. Cullen, C. Larson and Lassa
- Placed at the foot of the 12th on the calendar of 3-11-2014, Ayes 18, Noes 15
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Carpenter, Hansen, L. Taylor, Vinehout, Shilling, Miller, T. Cullen, C. Larson and Lassa
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Grothman
- Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table
- Read a second time
- Refused to refer to committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 14, Noes 18
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
- Ordered to a third reading
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On October 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 3, Noes 2
On October 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Labor
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 39
- Read a second time
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 39
- Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
- Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 placed after Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 58, Noes 39
- Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 39
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Ordered immediately messaged
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 1:01 PM on 5-8-2013 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 9
- Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Wachs, Hebl and Goyke
- Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Wachs, Hebl and Goyke
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Hebl, Wachs and Goyke
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 5-8-2013 by Committee on Rules
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 7, Noes 1
- Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 6, Noes 2
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 6, Noes 2
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On April 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative J. Ott
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1)
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Wachs
On April 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- LRB corrections (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1)
On April 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative J. Ott
- Public hearing held
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced by Representatives Jacque, Honadel, Kuglitsch, Murphy, Schraa, Spiros, Stone, Strachota, Thiesfeldt and Weininger; cosponsored by Senators Grothman and Lasee
+ − Amendments (10)
Assembly Amendment 1
Assembly Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 55, Noes 38
Senate Amendment 1
Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table
Senate Substitute Amendment 1
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 concurred in, Ayes 55, Noes 38, Paired 2
Senate Amendment 1
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Carpenter, Hansen, L. Taylor, Vinehout, Shilling, Miller, T. Cullen, C. Larson and Lassa
Assembly Amendment 3
Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 39
Assembly Amendment 2
Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 39
Assembly Substitute Amendment 3
Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 39
Assembly Amendment 1
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
Assembly Substitute Amendment 2
Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Wachs
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
+ − Votes (9)
March 20, 2014: Assembly Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 38
March 20, 2014: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 concurred in
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 38
March 12, 2014: Read a third time and concurred in as amended
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 16
March 11, 2014: Placed at the foot of the 12th on the calendar of 3-11-2014
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 15
March 11, 2014: Refused to refer to committee on Judiciary and Labor
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 18
May 8, 2013: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 39
May 8, 2013: Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 39
May 8, 2013: Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 39
May 8, 2013: Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 laid on table
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 39
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor