+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Labor
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On June 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On June 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 6-13-2013 by Committee on Rules
On May 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 7, Noes 1
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
- Public hearing held
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Goyke
On May 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice
- Introduced by Representatives Jacque, Richards, Czaja, Bernard Schaber, Berceau, Bernier, Billings, Brooks, Hebl, Hintz, Johnson, Jorgensen, Kahl, Kleefisch, Kolste, Marklein, A. Ott, Schraa, Sinicki, Stone, Stroebel, C. Taylor and Wright; cosponsored by Senators Ellis, Gudex, Hansen, Harris, Harsdorf, Jauch, Lassa, Olsen, Petrowski, Risser, Shilling, Schultz and Wirch
+ − Amendment
Assembly Amendment 1
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Goyke
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor