+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On November 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Published 11-23-2019
- Report approved by the Governor on 11-22-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 48
On November 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 11-15-2019 by directive of the Speaker
On October 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor
On October 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 10-11-2019
On October 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Senator Bewley added as a cosponsor
- Senator Miller added as a cosponsor
- Ordered immediately messaged
On October 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On October 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 7, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 7, Noes 0
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zimmerman
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On April 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representatives Skowronski and Kurtz added as coauthors
On April 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections
- Introduced by Representatives Zimmerman, Brostoff, Sortwell, Dittrich, Plumer, Steffen, Kulp, Ballweg, Rohrkaste, Felzkowski, Tusler, Sinicki, Anderson, Spiros, Petryk, Edming, Brooks, Thiesfeldt, Duchow, Brandtjen, Kuglitsch, Ramthun, Bowen and C. Taylor; cosponsored by Senators Bernier, Schachtner, Olsen, Wirch, Risser, Johnson, Ringhand and Nass
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor