+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On November 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
- Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs
On November 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a second time
On October 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 7, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 7, Noes 0
- Placed on calendar 11-5-2013 by Committee on Rules
On October 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kleefisch
On September 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Withdrawn from committee on Judiciary and referred to committee on Criminal Justice pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c)
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced by Representatives Bewley, Bernier, Czaja, Kleefisch, Smith, Stroebel, Thiesfeldt, Vruwink and Wright; cosponsored by Senators Lehman, Schultz and L. Taylor
+ − Amendment
Assembly Amendment 1
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor