+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On October 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On August 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kulp
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance
- Introduced by Representatives Kulp, Ballweg, Fields, Sortwell, Tittl, Steffen, Tusler, Murphy, Quinn and Thiesfeldt; cosponsored by Senators Bernier, Olsen, Jacque and Stroebel
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor