+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On August 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senator Grothman withdrawn as a cosponsor
On August 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Representative Thiesfeldt withdrawn as a coauthor
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Environment and Forestry, Ayes 6, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment and Forestry, Ayes 6, Noes 0
On August 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On August 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Honadel
On July 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On April 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment and Forestry
- Introduced by Representatives Honadel, Thiesfeldt, Barnes, Bies, Brooks, Hebl, Hulsey, Kolste, Ohnstad, A. Ott, Pasch, Riemer, Stone and Wright; cosponsored by Senators C. Larson, Cowles, Carpenter, Grothman, Harris, Olsen and L. Taylor
+ − Amendment
Assembly Amendment 1
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment and Forestry, Ayes 6, Noes 0
+ − Sponsor
Honadel
Type:
Primary Sponsor