+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Utilities and Housing
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a second time
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules
On June 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 7, Noes 1
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 3
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On May 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Plumer
On May 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Novak added as a coauthor
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefit Reform
- Introduced by Representatives Plumer, Steineke, Rodriguez, Snyder, Pronschinske, Kurtz, James, Dittrich, Felzkowski, Rohrkaste, Tittl, Mursau, Spiros, Steffen, Allen, Duchow, Kulp, Petryk, Petersen, Thiesfeldt, Kitchens, Edming, Schraa, Krug, Murphy, Subeck and Sinicki; cosponsored by Senators Olsen and Carpenter
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor