+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 0
On March 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Ramthun added as a coauthor
- Public hearing held
On February 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced by Representative Loudenbeck; cosponsored by Senator Ballweg
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor