+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Laid on the table
On March 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 3-17-2021 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 0
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representatives Ramthun and Vruwink added as coauthors
- Executive action taken
- Public hearing held
On March 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor
On February 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced by Representatives Duchow, Kitchens, Thiesfeldt and Skowronski; cosponsored by Senators Ballweg, Testin and Feyen