+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on Senate Organization
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On February 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 9:36 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Law Revision Committee