+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On June 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On June 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 6-22-2021 by Committee on Rules
On May 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0
On April 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced by Representatives Brooks, Armstrong, Brandtjen, Dittrich, Kuglitsch, Murphy, Mursau, Skowronski, Tusler and Wichgers; cosponsored by Senators Jacque and Ballweg
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor