+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
On November 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Received in the House.
On November 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6613; text: CR S6613-6614)
On September 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 223.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor