+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Senate concurred in House amendment and adopted resolution
- House Message received
- Completed legislative action
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Adopted by House, House Calendar (Voice vote)
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Reported by the Clerk
- On Unfinished Business, House Calendar
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- With amendment, be adopted
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To House Rules
- To Rules
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Adopted by Senate (Voice vote)
- On Unfinished Business
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- On Unfinished Business
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor