+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to Senate
- Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
- Reported by the Clerk
- On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Be adopted
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Rules
- To House Rules
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Adopted by Senate (Voice vote)
- On Unfinished Business
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported be adopted
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- On Unfinished Business
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor