+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
- Reported by the Clerk
- On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
- Completed legislative action
On March 5, 2016 in the House:
- Be adopted
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Adopted by Senate (Voice vote)
- Reported be adopted
- Immediate consideration
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- To Rules
- To House Rules
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- On Unfinished Business
On February 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor