+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to Senate
- Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
- Reported by the Clerk
- From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Be adopted
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Rules
- To House Rules
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Adopted by Senate (Voice vote)
- Immediate consideration
- Reported be adopted
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- On Unfinished Business
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor