+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to Senate
- Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
- Reported by the Clerk
- On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
On March 5, 2016 in the House:
- Be adopted
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Rules
- To House Rules
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Adopted by Senate (Voice vote)
- Immediate consideration
- Reported be adopted
On February 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- On Unfinished Business
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
- Filed for introduction