+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to Senate
- Adopted by House, House Calendar (Voice vote)
- Reported by the Clerk
- On Unfinished Business, House Calendar
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Be adopted
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Rules
- To House Rules
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Adopted by Senate (Voice vote)
- Committee reference dispensed
- Immediate consideration
- On Unfinished Business
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
- Filed for introduction