+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary then Rules
- Introduced in House
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Adopted by Senate (Voice vote)
- On Unfinished Business
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported be adopted
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Unfinished Business
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor