+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 14, 2015 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to Senate
- Adopted by House (Voice vote)
- Reported by the Clerk
- Immediate consideration
- Be adopted
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Rules
- To House Rules
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Adopted by Senate (Voice vote)
- On Unfinished Business
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported be adopted
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- On Unfinished Business
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
- Filed for introduction