+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to Senate
- Adopted by House (Voice vote)
- Immediate consideration
- Be adopted
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Unfinished Business
- Adopted by Senate (Voice vote)
- Ordered to House
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Rules
- To House Rules
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported be adopted
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- On Unfinished Business
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
- Filed for introduction