+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chapter 34, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/18/14
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/18/14 - House Journal #2839
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/18/14 - Senate Journal #54
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/13/14 - House Journal #2526
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/13/14
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 1)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 241)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 1)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §61 - 5 - 17 - (Amended Code)
- §18 B- 1 - 5 b - (New Code)