+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chapter 22, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/12/20
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/11/20
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/12/20 - House Journal #0
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/12/20 - Senate Journal #585
- To Governor 3/11/20 - Senate Journal #570
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- To Governor 3/11/20 - House Journal #0
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 461)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 462)
- Completed legislative action
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 29, 2020 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- To House Finance
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- To Finance
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 218)
- Read 2nd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 219)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 219)
- Ordered to House
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced in House
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- To Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (5)
March 3, 2020: Effective from passage (Roll No. 462)
March 3, 2020: Passed House (Roll No. 461)
February 21, 2020: Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 218)
February 21, 2020: Effective from passage (Roll No. 219)
February 21, 2020: Passed Senate (Roll No. 219)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor