+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 262)
- Read 3rd time
- Motion withdrawn
- Motion to refer to Rules
- On 3rd reading
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Economic Development
- Introduced in Senate
- To Economic Development
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §31 G- 4 - 5 a - (New Code)
+ − Vote
February 25, 2020: Passed Senate (Roll No. 262)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor