+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chapter 174, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
On March 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/20
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/13/20
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal #0
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal #586
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- To Governor 3/13/20 - House Journal #0
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/13/20 - Senate Journal #573
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 478)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On February 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 361)
- House Message received
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 413)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
- Read 1st time
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 214)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 215)
- Ordered to House
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Education
- To House Education
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Education
- Introduced in Senate
- To Education
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- §18 B- 3 C- 16 - (Amended Code)