+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chapter 113, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
On March 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/20
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/18/20
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal #0
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 540)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 540)
- Senate requests House to concur
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 758)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- To Governor 3/18/20 - Senate Journal #577
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- To Governor 3/18/20 - House Journal #0
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal #586
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 759)
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 528)
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 3rd time
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 530)
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 529)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- To House Education
- To Education
- Introduced in House
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 234)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 234)
- Ordered to House
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Education
- Introduced in Senate
- To Education
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Statute Amended
- §18 - 2 - 43 - (New Code)