+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter 201, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/21/21
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/16/21
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/21/21 - House Journal #0
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/21/21 - Senate Journal #510
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- To Governor 4/16/21 - House Journal #0
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/16/21 - Senate Journal #488
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Communicated to House
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 401)
- Completed legislative action
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 527)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- To House Health and Human Resources
- To Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in House
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 255)
- Read 3rd time
- Ordered to House
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
- Originating in Senate Health and Human Resources
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- §30 - 3 E- 1 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 3 E- 2 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 3 E- 3 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 3 E- 4 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 3 E- 9 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 3 E- 10 - (Repealed Code)
- §30 - 3 E- 10 a - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 3 E- 11 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 3 E- 12 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 3 E- 13 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 3 E- 17 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2021: Passed House (Roll No. 527)
March 30, 2021: Passed Senate (Roll No. 255)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor