+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- To House Finance
- To Finance
- Introduced in House
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 284)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
- Originating in Senate Judiciary
+ − Statute Amended
- §59 - 1 - 2 b - (New Code)
+ − Vote
March 2, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 284)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor