+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/29/16
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/28/16
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/29/16 - Senate Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/29/2016 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/28/16 - Senate Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/28/16 - House Journal #0
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 461)
- Senate requests House to concur
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 613)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 534)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 283)
- Read 3rd time
- Ordered to House
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
- Originating in Senate Judiciary
+ − Statute Amended
- §44 - 8 - 1 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (4)
March 11, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 534)
March 2, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 283)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor