+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 282)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
- Originating in Senate Judiciary
+ − Statutes Amended (14)
- § 7 - 25 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- § 7 - 25 - 8 - (Amended Code)
- § 7 - 25 - 15 - (Repealed Code)
- § 7 - 25 - 17 - (Repealed Code)
- § 7 - 25 - 19 - (Repealed Code)
- § 7 - 25 - 21 - (Repealed Code)
- § 7 - 25 - 22 - (Repealed Code)
- §60 - 5 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- §60 - 5 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §60 - 5 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §60 - 5 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §60 - 5 - 6 - (Amended Code)
- §60 - 5 - 7 - (Amended Code)
- §60 - 5 - 8 - (Amended Code)
+ − Vote
March 2, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 282)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor