+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- House rejected (Roll No. 335)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- To House Judiciary
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 26)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §21 - 5 - 12 - (Amended Code)
- §21 - 5 - 1 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2018: House rejected (Roll No. 335)
January 29, 2018: Passed Senate (Roll No. 26)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor