+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/30/16
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/28/16
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/30/16 - Senate Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/30/2016 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/28/16 - Senate Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/28/16 - House Journal #0
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 455)
- House Message received
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 533)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 281)
- Motion to lie over rejected
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- §17 C- 6 - 8 - (Amended Code)
- § 7 - 1 - 3pp - (New Code)
- § 8 - 12 - 5 g - (New Code)
- §22 - 6 A- 7 - (Amended Code)
- § 7 - 1 - 3qq - (New Code)