+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- To House Education
- To Education then Finance
- Introduced in House
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 279)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- Senator Plymale requests to be removed as sponsor of bill
- On 1st reading
On February 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Education
- Introduced in Senate
- To Education
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §18 B- 10 - 1 - (Amended Code)