+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter 81, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/21
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/16/21
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - House Journal #0
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - Senate Journal #520
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- To Governor 4/16/21 - House Journal #0
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/16/21 - Senate Journal #487
- House Message received
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Completed legislative action
- Passed House (Roll No. 574)
- Communicated to Senate
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Do pass
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 253)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- Reported do pass
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- § 8 - 10 - 2 a - (Amended Code)
- § 8 - 10 - 2 b - (Amended Code)
- §50 - 3 - 2 a - (Amended Code)
- §62 - 4 - 17 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (2)
April 9, 2021: Passed House (Roll No. 574)
March 30, 2021: Passed Senate (Roll No. 253)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor