+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/11/16 - House Journal #0
- Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 - Senate Journal #27
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/11/16 - Senate Journal #102
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/11/16
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to Senate
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 390)
On March 5, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To House Health and Human Resources
- To Health and Human Resources
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 257)
- Read 3rd time
- Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 256)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
On February 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 1st reading 2/28/16
- On 1st reading
On February 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in Senate
- To Health and Human Resources
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- §30 - 3 - 10 a - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 4 - 15 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 5 - 17 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 7 - 6 a - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 8 - 16 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 14 - 12 b - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 20 - 13 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 21 - 17 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 28 - 8 a - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 390)
March 1, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 257)
March 1, 2016: Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 256)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor