+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 226)
- Read 3rd time
On February 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 3rd reading 2/28/16
- On 3rd reading
On February 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (20)
- §44 - 5 B- 1 - (New Code)
- §44 - 5 B- 2 - (New Code)
- §44 - 5 B- 3 - (New Code)
- §44 - 5 B- 4 - (New Code)
- §44 - 5 B- 5 - (New Code)
- §44 - 5 B- 6 - (New Code)
- §44 - 5 B- 7 - (New Code)
- §44 - 5 B- 8 - (New Code)
- §44 - 5 B- 9 - (New Code)
- §44 - 5 B- 10 - (New Code)
- §44 - 5 B- 11 - (New Code)
- §44 - 5 B- 12 - (New Code)
- §44 - 5 B- 13 - (New Code)
- §44 - 5 B- 14 - (New Code)
- §44 - 5 B- 15 - (New Code)
- §44 - 5 B- 16 - (New Code)
- §44 - 5 B- 17 - (New Code)
- §44 - 5 B- 18 - (New Code)
- §44 - 5 B- 19 - (New Code)
- §44 - 5 B- 20 - (New Code)
+ − Vote
February 29, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 226)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor