+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter 170, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/19
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/20/19
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 544)
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 696)
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 697)
- Communicated to Senate
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 544)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
- To Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal #284
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- To Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal #0
- Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal #0
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal #294
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 428)
- Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 428)
- House Message received
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Passed House (Roll No. 428)
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 429)
On March 2, 2019 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 188)
- On 3rd reading with right to amend
- Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 3rd time
- Ordered to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 188)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Energy
- To House Energy
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 2nd reading 2/19/19
- On 2nd reading
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
- Originating in Senate Energy, Industry and Mining
+ − Amendments (17)
+ − Statutes Amended (32)
- § 5 B- 2 A- 5 - (Amended Code)
- § 5 B- 2 A- 6 - (Amended Code)
- § 5 B- 2 A- 8 - (Amended Code)
- § 5 B- 2 A- 9 - (Amended Code)
- §22 - 3 - 14 - (Amended Code)
- §22 - 11 - 10 - (Amended Code)
- §22 - 30 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §22 - 30 - 24 - (Amended Code)
- §22 A- 1 - 21 - (Amended Code)
- §22 A- 1 - 35 - (Amended Code)
- §22 A- 1 A- 1 - (Amended Code)
- §22 A- 2 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §22 A- 2 - 12 - (Amended Code)
- §22 A- 2 - 80 - (New Code)
- §22 A- 2 A- 405 - (Amended Code)
- §22 A- 3 - 12 - (Amended Code)
- §22 A- 8 - 5 - (Amended Code)
- §22 A- 13 - 1 - (New Code)
- §22 A- 13 - 2 - (New Code)
- §22 A- 13 - 3 - (New Code)
- §22 A- 13 - 4 - (New Code)
- §22 A- 13 - 5 - (New Code)
- §22 A- 13 - 6 - (New Code)
- §11 - 28 - 1 - (New Code)
- §11 - 28 - 2 - (New Code)
- §11 - 28 - 3 - (New Code)
- §22 A- 1 - 43 - (New Code)
- §22 A- 1 A- 2 - (Amended Code)
- §22 A- 2 - 13 - (Amended Code)
- §22 A- 8 - 10 - (New Code)
- §61 - 3 - 12 - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 3 B- 6 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (10)
March 9, 2019: Effective from passage (Roll No. 544)
March 9, 2019: Effective from passage (Roll No. 697)
March 8, 2019: Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 428)
March 8, 2019: Effective from passage (Roll No. 428)
March 4, 2019: Passed House (Roll No. 428)
March 4, 2019: Effective from passage (Roll No. 429)
February 21, 2019: Effective from passage (Roll No. 188)
February 21, 2019: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 188)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor