+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On March 5, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on House Calender
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- To House Health and Human Resources
- To Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in House
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 250)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 251)
- Ordered to House
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
On February 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 1st reading 2/28/16
- On 1st reading
On February 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in Senate
- To Health and Human Resources
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §30 - 3 - 10 b - (New Code)
- §30 - 14 - 12 d - (New Code)