+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chapter 315, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/5/20 - House Journal #0
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/5/20
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- To Governor 2/28/20 - House Journal #0
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Governor 2/28/20
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 270)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 269)
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To House Education
- To Education
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 87)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 87)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Education
- Introduced in Senate
- To Education
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §18 A- 3 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- §18 A- 3 - 1 f - (Amended Code)