+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/29/16
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/28/16
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/29/16 - Senate Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/29/15 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/28/16 - Senate Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/28/16 - House Journal #0
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 454)
- Senate requests House to concur
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 581)
- House reconsidered motion to concur in Senate amendment with further amendment
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 625)
- House reconsidered and withdrew title amendment
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 532)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
- Read 1st time
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 189)
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Ordered to House
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Roads and Transportation then Judiciary
- To House Roads and Transportation
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- §24 A- 2 - 7 - (New Code)
- §15 - 2 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §23 - 2 - 1 - (Amended Code)