+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chapter 60, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/5/20 - House Journal #0
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/5/20
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- To Governor 2/28/20 - House Journal #0
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Governor 2/28/20
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 176)
- House Message received
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 220)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 77)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §62 - 12 - 13 - (Amended Code)
- §62 - 12 - 13 c - (New Code)