+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (46)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter 146, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/1/16
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/24/16
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/1/16 - Senate Journal #21
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/1/2016 - House Journal #0
- To Governor 3/24/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/24/16 - Senate Journal #16
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 518)
- Senate requests House to concur
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 626)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Effective ninety days from passage
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 531)
- Passed House (Roll No. 530)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 210)
- Ordered to House
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- To Government Organization
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- §29 A- 1 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §29 A- 3 - 5 - (Amended Code)
- §29 A- 3 - 11 - (Amended Code)
- §29 A- 3 - 19 - (New Code)
- §29 A- 3 A- 20 - (New Code)
- §29 A- 3 C- 1 - (New Code)
- §29 A- 3 C- 2 - (New Code)
- §29 A- 3 C- 3 - (New Code)
- §29 A- 3 C- 4 - (New Code)
- §29 A- 3 C- 5 - (New Code)
- §29 A- 3 C- 6 - (New Code)
- §29 A- 3 - 20 - (New Code)